Financial history FRIENDS OF PLYMOUTH SCHOOL OF CREATIVE ARTS

Charity number: 1169628
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £9.72k £18.83k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.05k £14.09k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.00k N/A N/A N/A