Financial history THE PENRITH SINGERS

Charity number: 508770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.72k £3.26k £5.09k £14.76k £22.00k
Total expenditure £7.11k £4.42k £5.70k £13.37k £14.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.08k £1.45k