SKELWITH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The community centre provides a focul point for the surrounding rural district, where community groups and individuals can hire the building for events, educational classes,or meetings, at a reasonable cost.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 July 1979: Standard registration
- SKELWITH + DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRUST (Working name)
- SKELWITH COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Howes | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin John Pickering | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lathwood | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank Geoffrey Broughton | Trustee | 29 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BRYAN MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.18k | £15.15k | £5.59k | £10.90k | £13.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £6.58k | £5.93k | £9.42k | £14.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JANUARY 1979
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE FORMER PARISH OF BRATHAY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES FOR ALL FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARSH OF BRATHAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
School House
Skelwith Bridge
AMBLESIDE
Cumbria
LA22 9NW
- Phone:
- 01539432594
- Email:
- trust@skelwith.community
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window