Financial history THE OLDHAM COLISEUM THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 508829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.93m £1.49m £2.01m £2.10m £1.00m
Total expenditure £2.15m £1.19m £1.77m £2.45m £692.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £844.77k £1.44m £1.19m £855.88k £996.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £905.97k £1.47m £107.38k £55.04k £4.60k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £17.72k £703.90k £1.18m £2.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £425 £960 £77 £1.66k £812
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £855.88k £996.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £1.15m £1.72m £2.38m £692.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.85k £370 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £64.31k £41.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £130.66k £34.71k £46.24k £76.27k £0