Trustees THE OLDHAM COLISEUM THEATRE LIMITED
Charity number: 508829

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Crosby | Chair | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Overend | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jyothi Kuna | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rakhi Sinha Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Louise Pennington | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Buckley | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Matthew Wright | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jo Schofield | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Thistlethwaite | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Megan Holland | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Thompson | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Moss | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martina Murphy | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Chaplin | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rose Taylor | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.