Financial history Giraffe Children’s Library

Charity Number: 1170053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.85k £2.86k £3.99k £5.05k £4.41k
Total expenditure £1.80k £591 £1.59k £2.19k £657
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A