Trustees NEW FELLOWSHIP CIO

Charity number: 1169803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Louise Whitbread Chair 15 March 2020
None on record
Daniel Carlson Trustee 19 January 2025
THE RELIGIOUS DRAMA SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Deborah Kisekka Trustee 03 March 2024
THE BESOM IN CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Peter Nicholas Cairns Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Emma Atkins Trustee 10 July 2022
None on record
Zoe Smith Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record