EBENEZER CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ebenezer Church serves the community of Grangetown, Cardiff by providing and maintaining a place for worship and teaching and socializing. The Christian faith is proclaimed to fulfil the spiritual needs of the community. By providing a coffee morning, and a FAN group the church seeks to provide social, educational and outreach activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£531,474
Donations and legacies | £5.25k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £526.22k |
Total expenditure:
£293,340
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other | £293.34k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £293.34k | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £238.13k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
- 10 July 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1066832 THE GEORGE MULLER CHARITABLE TRUST
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 516627 SULLY COMMUNITY CHURCH
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1168051 Sports Chaplaincy UK and Ireland
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1115695 RWANDA RESTORED
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 215409 THE OPEN-AIR MISSION
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1198881 REFLECT COMMUNITY CHURCH
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1111108 THE BAY CHURCH
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 234557 WESTERN COUNTIES AND SOUTH WALES EVANGELIZATION TR...
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1139456 CARDIFF FOODBANK
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 207994 MARIE CURIE
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1088856 THE RAINBOW OF HOPE/PARADISE RUN
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1023311 THE CITY HOSPICE TRUST LIMITED
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 208217 THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1171348 SHOW JESUS
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 232759 THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN BIBLE SOCIETY
- EBENEZER GOSPEL HALL (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.69k | £70.12k | £31.47k | £36.56k | £531.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.08k | £102.12k | £29.44k | £33.73k | £293.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £526.22k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £293.34k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £268.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017 as amended on 10 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MEANS OF PROCLAIMING THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELICAL AND TEACHING NATURE: BY SENSITIVELY NEW FOLLOWERS BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE FOR WORSHIP OF GOD AND FACILITATING THE PRACTICE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY EXISTING FOLLOWERS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window