Accounts and annual returns GRANTHAM DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required