Financial history GRANTHAM DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.29k £11.58k £19.14k £6.38k £6.63k
Total expenditure £9.88k £18.93k £12.02k £5.42k £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A