Financial history BERNICIAN STUDIES GROUP

Charity number: 1170897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.16k £651 £585 £900 £1.17k
Total expenditure £456 £504 £731 £887 £955
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A