BERNICIAN STUDIES GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BSG studies the ancient kingdom of Bernicia which existed in the 6th and 7th Century AD. This involves, but is not restricted to, studying the history, geography, economy, and language of the region. It involves looking at the position of Bernicia in the context of the emerging kingdoms which were to come together to make England. BSG also shares and disseminates its knowledge and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 December 2016: Standard registration
- BSG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Cowans | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Haycock | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN KATHERINE WARD MA | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAY SHEPHERD | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JOY RUTTER | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16k | £651 | £585 | £900 | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £456 | £504 | £731 | £887 | £955 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BERNICIA, AN ANGLO-SAXON KINGDOM ESTABLISHED BY ANGLIAN SETTLERS OF THE 6TH CENTURY IN WHAT IS NOW SOUTH-EASTERN SCOTLAND AND NORTH EAST ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 WENLOCK ROAD
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE34 9BA
- Phone:
- 01914556785
- Email:
- bernicianstudies@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window