Financial history THE GOOD SHEPHERD CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1172505
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £101.55k £90.10k £73.84k £125.25k £62.82k
Total expenditure £128.01k £77.60k £83.76k £133.32k £45.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A