Financial history TYNE AND WEAR BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 509133
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £536.26k £1.07m £541.24k £769.62k £484.70k
Total expenditure £460.30k £820.36k £555.58k £844.59k £586.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.30k N/A
Income from government grants £142.37k £261.21k £353.69k £606.63k £268.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £347.04k £832.26k £358.93k £608.50k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £189.22k £158.03k £142.89k £132.60k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £25.16k £28.19k N/A
Income - Other £0 £82.11k £14.27k £325 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £460.30k £820.36k £555.58k £844.59k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £22.06k £26.97k £29.08k £115.95k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A