Financial history PIPPA'S GROUP

Charity number: 1171697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £114.63k £127.94k £124.48k £147.22k £148.99k
Total expenditure £114.14k £118.18k £126.07k £136.12k £149.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £59.26k £66.31k £86.46k £84.30k £94.27k