Accounts and annual returns THE STATHERN CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 1171028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 06 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 06 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2022 08 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 08 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 24 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2019 03 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 03 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window