Financial history NESIVOS HATORAH LTD

Charity Number: 1172367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £159.33k £294.16k £173.62k £231.72k £251.69k
Total expenditure £98.65k £124.34k £124.49k £127.39k £125.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A