MANDELA8

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance arts, culture and heritage in Princes Park and the surrounding areas of Liverpool 8 for public benefit through the installation of a memorial to Nelson Mandela and a series of educational programmes promoting diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SONIA BASSEY MBE | Chair | 07 February 2017 |
|
|||||
David Brown | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Duhaney | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.98k | £151.09k | £67.32k | £137.12k | £84.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.23k | £60.49k | £54.09k | £235.65k | £67.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | £47.50k | £1.60k | £10.00k | £19.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2017 as amended on 08 Dec 2020 as amended on 05 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
- To advance arts, culture and heritage in Princes Park and the surrounding areas of Liverpool 8 for public benefit through the installation of a memorial to Nelson Mandela and a series of educational programmes promoting diversity. - To undertake educational programmes to improve life chances of individuals of all ages. - To alleviate poverty.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Harvey Guinan Llp
Unit 17
Mersey House
140 Speke Road
Garston
LIVERPOO
- Phone:
- 0151 709 7797
- Email:
- mandelaliverpool8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window