Financial history PETERBOROUGH RAPE CRISIS CARE GROUP

Charity Number: 1170957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £622.71k £490.74k £507.46k £736.70k £425.08k
Total expenditure £670.76k £337.04k £472.86k £594.21k £622.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £727.59k £411.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.68k N/A £4.17k £9.12k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £613.02k N/A £503.29k £727.59k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £670.76k N/A £472.86k £594.21k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £8.28k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A