RABBIT RESCUE NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1170499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rehabilitation, rehoming and treatment of rabbits

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £29,246
Total expenditure: £28,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jessica Wood Chair 08 July 2022
None on record
Bethany Rose Ann Spicer Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Briony Thornley Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Michele Dalton Trustee 08 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £34.51k £37.76k £26.57k £34.43k £29.25k
Total expenditure £35.31k £32.48k £28.68k £32.43k £28.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 07 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Harlech Drive
LEYLAND
PR25 4YX
Phone:
07788371591