Financial history THE RAINDANCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1172166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.00k £75.00k £100.00k £75.00k £112.50k
Total expenditure £80.41k £84.52k £92.19k £92.32k £103.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A