Financial history RYEDALE SPECIAL FAMILIES

Charity Number: 1170988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £672.02k £691.14k £708.63k £917.15k £1.44m
Total expenditure £577.43k £525.87k £634.12k £746.88k £928.23k
Income from government contracts £330.03k £366.41k £378.27k £385.35k £787.05k
Income from government grants N/A £48.35k £17.84k N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £97.28k £77.12k £24.14k £49.96k £73.14k
Income - Other trading activities £91.19k £45.84k £0 £484 £105.87k
Income - Charitable activities £483.31k £525.50k £614.12k £689.04k £1.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £238 £101 £40 £1.95k £9.14k
Income - Other £0 £42.59k £70.33k £175.71k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £30.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £546.92k £513.46k £616.33k £720.50k £910.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.51k £12.40k £17.80k £26.38k £17.57k
Expenditure - Governance £2.85k £2.00k £2.07k £2.55k £9.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0