Trustees RYEDALE SPECIAL FAMILIES
Charity number: 1170988

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Shepherdson | Chair | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Goodfellow | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Mitchelmore | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Simpson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Cundall MBE | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUTH HATTON | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIOBAN OSTOJA-STARZEWSKA | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GARROD | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.