Financial history HOLMFIRTH CIVIC HALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1172232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £167.21k £128.96k £211.36k £159.17k £219.96k
Total expenditure £123.62k £97.81k £207.39k £218.55k £198.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.00k £63.74k £72.89k £30.00k £17.32k