Trustees SAMARITANS OF MID CHESHIRE
Charity number: 1170575

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernice Constance Lilian Philps | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
RONALD EDWARD MCLAVERTY | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Norma Mills | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Donat Burke | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN MUNNERY | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANA BROWN | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE COLES | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAN SCAPLEHORN | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clarke | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDI BOARDMAN | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.