Financial history EMMAUS STAFFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1171570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £434.94k £378.44k £417.41k £540.56k £508.45k
Total expenditure £329.47k £364.47k £479.97k £525.46k £546.19k
Income from government contracts £39.96k £40.00k £40.07k £30.00k N/A
Income from government grants £136.58k £53.11k N/A £47.47k £60.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £24.35k £19.12k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £119.43k £402.56k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £396.26k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £518 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.28k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £174.15k £267.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £351.31k £278.58k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £174.15k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0