EMMAUS STAFFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND WORK TO PREVIOUSLY HOMELESS PEOPLE. SOCIAL FURNITURE SCHEME RECYCLING FACILITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £60,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 10 February 2017: Standard registration
- EMMAUS NORTH STAFFS (Working name)
- EMMAUS POTTERIES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Douglas Beacon | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lori Lei Wood Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph McShane | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Harris | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Sherlock | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BERNARD FARRAR MAAT DCHA | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE HAYLOCK ALMOND CBE DL | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||
TONY STEPHENSON | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.94k | £378.44k | £417.41k | £540.56k | £508.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.47k | £364.47k | £479.97k | £525.46k | £546.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £39.96k | £40.00k | £40.07k | £30.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £136.58k | £53.11k | N/A | £47.47k | £60.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.35k | £19.12k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £119.43k | £402.56k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £396.26k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £518 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.28k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £174.15k | £267.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £351.31k | £278.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £174.15k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.26k | £7.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £268.15k | £148.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £101.01k | £87.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ALLEVIATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, IN CONFORMANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EMMAUS MOVEMENT AS PUBLISHED FROM TIME TO TIME BY EMMAUS UK, TO THOSE IN NEED WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY: 1) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, OR ASSISTANCE IN SUCH PROVISION, FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE IN THE STAFFORDSHIRE AREA AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME (THE BENEFICIARIES). 2) THE REHABILITATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES AS APPROPRIATE AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, EMPLOYMENT TRAINING) AND WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND SATISFACTION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WITH THE PURPOSE OF DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT IN THE FUTURE AND THEREBY DEVELOP A SENSE OF SELF WORTH AND DIGNITY THROUGH HAVING A SELF-SUPPORTING LIFE. 3) THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF OTHER EMMAUS COMMUNITIES AND EMMAUS GROUPS OR OTHER AGENCIES IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HOMELESSNESS WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE EXCHANGE OF RESOURCES, INFORMATION AND EXPERTISE WITH OTHER EMMAUS MOVEMENT PROJECTS WORLDWIDE. 4) THE FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmaus North Staffs
New Hall Street
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 5HQ
- Phone:
- 01782 846111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window