Financial history ACCESS ALL AREAS

Charity number: 1172706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £671.32k £666.38k £811.43k £885.13k £1.24m
Total expenditure £630.25k £657.27k £807.54k £884.21k £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £101.73k N/A
Income from government grants £287.72k £470.70k £452.31k £208.60k £422.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04k £1.17k £314 £850 £772
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £667.22k £665.19k £811.12k £884.28k £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £68 £20 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £630.25k £657.27k £807.54k £884.21k £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.40k £1.75k £0 £1.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0