Financial history ALDRIDGE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1170932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £905.40k £835.63k £866.49k £613.68k £300.07k
Total expenditure £699.37k £821.50k £862.09k £653.63k £543.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £885.68k £816.76k £856.63k £610.92k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £5.99k £450 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £304 £56 £78 £64 N/A
Income - Other £13.43k £18.37k £9.78k £2.69k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £651.18k £774.92k £821.84k £612.06k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.19k £46.58k £40.24k £41.58k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.83k £9.46k £9.69k £9.06k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £293.39k £467.93k £362.87k £131.40k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A