Financial history TELFORD AFRICAN & AFRO-CARIBBEAN RESOURCE CENTRE (TAARC)

Charity number: 1171645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £10.85k £7.53k £33.48k £30.99k £36.12k
Total expenditure £9.96k £7.05k £29.16k £29.40k £34.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.25k £7.42k £19.76k £5.37k N/A