TELFORD AFRICAN & AFRO-CARIBBEAN RESOURCE CENTRE (TAARC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TAARC seeks to create safe spaces within the community in order to support disadvantaged children, young people and vulnerable adults. This aim includes, creating a place for social, educational and community activities, such as, Youth Clubs, over 60's dinner & dance, community Family Fun Day events and more; plus building and strengthening community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
81 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 16 February 2017: CIO registration
- TAARC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N HEADLEY | Chair | 16 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Nakita Rutherford | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Thomas | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.85k | £7.53k | £33.48k | £30.99k | £36.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.96k | £7.05k | £29.16k | £29.40k | £34.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.25k | £7.42k | £19.76k | £5.37k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TELFORD & WREKIN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY TELFORD & WREKIN COUNCIL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hub
Brookdale
Hadley
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF1 6LP
- Phone:
- 07428773174
- Email:
- contactus@taarc.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window