Financial history SHREE SWAMINARAYAN MANDIR BHUJ

Charity number: 1171929
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £889.53k £3.53m £2.52m £2.77m £1.23m
Total expenditure £175.20k £272.15k £175.46k £808.67k £2.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £889.53k £3.53m £2.52m £2.77m £1.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £70.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.53m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £170.12k £264.23k £141.04k £808.67k £470.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.08k £7.93k £34.42k £0 £2.01m
Expenditure - Governance £12.02k £18.53k £39.95k £79.30k £16.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £55.00k £205.77k £20.09k £325.46k £270.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0