Trustees 9TH DONCASTER SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509507
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Graham Harrop Chair 23 January 2024
None on record
Philip Craig Stewart Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Alicia May Motson Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Samuel Thomas Finn Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
PAUL STEAD Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
James Hagyard Trustee 23 January 2024
DONCASTER DANUM SCOUTS
Received: 51 days late
Malcolm Charles Rigg Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
DAVID MENAI WILLIAMS Trustee 29 October 2023
YORKSHIRE SCHOOLS EXPLORING SOCIETY
Received: On time
Carol Motson Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
VICTORIA VICKERS Trustee
None on record
CATHERINE LOUISE LAMBERT Trustee
None on record