Financial history CATERHAM, OXTED AND GODSTONE LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1172327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.52k £4.83k £31.01k £31.73k £31.94k
Total expenditure £22.15k £7.03k £19.56k £27.35k £32.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A