Financial history BALSALL COMMON LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1173183
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £37.62k £25.77k £86.41k £49.67k £62.17k
Total expenditure £51.71k £21.61k £70.28k £56.12k £64.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A