Trustees STAINSBY FOLK GROUP

Charity number: 509610
Charity reporting is up to date (130 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr HUGH ELLIS Chair
None on record
Dr Mary Cryan Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Adele Louise Gillibrand Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Ashley Louise Gobbi Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Roger William Warren Trustee 28 March 2021
None on record
Owain Thomas Davies Ellis Trustee 23 February 2020
None on record
Richard John Renshaw Trustee 23 February 2020
None on record
Bethan Davies Ellis Trustee 23 February 2020
None on record
Alice Martin Trustee 28 October 2017
None on record
Vince Briers Trustee 28 October 2017
None on record
Ian Gobbi Trustee 28 October 2017
None on record
Bob Betts Trustee 15 October 2012
None on record
TONY TRAFFORD Trustee 12 March 1989
FIRST ART
Received: On time
EMMA FARNDON Trustee
None on record
TIM FARNDON Trustee
None on record
CHRIS ELLIS Trustee
None on record
ZARA GILLIBRAND Trustee
None on record
KATE GILLIBRAND Trustee
None on record