Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE VINE SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 1171476

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Jacobs | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Smith | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NEATH | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Charlotte Smith | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Caroline Kingstone | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew MArk Bryce | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Powell-Wiffin | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sheridan | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV William James Briggs | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Ian Horton | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES HILL | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.