MALVERN WELCOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN WORCESTERSHIRE BY PROVIDING HOUSING, ADVICE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT (INCLUDING GRANTS OR LOANS) TO MEET IDENTIFIED NEEDS B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF S
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,617 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAN HERBERT | Chair | 28 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Fiona Ann Carmichael | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Matthews | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WATSON RAINE | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY THORP | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Heydon Stockford | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.81k | £14.54k | £32.18k | £18.81k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.52k | £4.67k | £23.04k | £19.80k | £23.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN WORCESTERSHIRE BY PROVIDING HOUSING, ADVICE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT (INCLUDING GRANTS OR LOANS) TO MEET IDENTIFIED NEEDS B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND IN PARTICULAR MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN WORCESTERSHIRE, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT D) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING: EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND HOUSING SERVICES TO MEET IDENTIFIED NEEDS E) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malvern Welcomes c/o
112 Worcester Road
Malvern Link
Worcester
WR14 4DS
- Phone:
- 07772 589814
- Email:
- info@malvernwelcomes.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window