Accounts and annual returns TRINITY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 509633
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 01 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 19 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2014 21 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 21 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 07 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 07 May 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 08 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 08 May 2013 On Time