Financial history TRINITY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 509633
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £289.42k £412.98k £287.62k £295.27k £296.81k
Total expenditure £317.79k £293.63k £297.60k £278.81k £316.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.33k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0