YOUTH HOMELESS NORTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objective is 'to prevent, tackle & resolve youth homelessness experienced by young people aged 14 - 25 years old in the north of England', by: Amplifying the voice of young people Brokering strategic solutions Increasing early intervention & prevention Developing delivery models Increasing knowledge & awareness Working in partnership to our values to create sustainability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 03 April 2017: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YOUTH HOMELESS NORTH EAST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.59k | £61.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.82k | £39.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 21 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 21 May 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT, TACKLE AND RESOLVE HOMELESSNESS EXPERIENCED BY YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 14 TO 25 YEARS OLD IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND BY; * PROVIDING A VOICE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PARTICIPATORY RESEARCH * DELIVERING YOUTH-LED, NEEDS-LED PROJECTS AND TRAINING * DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING INNOVATION AND BEST PRACTICE THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH SECTOR PARTNERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE * INFLUENCING POLICY, STRATEGY AND SERVICE DELIVERY THROUGH REGIONAL AND NATIONAL NETWORKING AND STRATEGIC EVENTS * CAMPAIGNING TO END YOUTH HOMELESSNESS THROUGH COLLECTIVE IMPACT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window