Financial history RIDE ON - CYCLING FOR ALL

Charity Number: 1174055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £108.90k £133.02k £181.74k £161.19k £169.32k
Total expenditure £92.00k £114.34k £158.81k £159.94k £160.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £560 £17.49k £21.01k £6.34k N/A