Financial history HOLLYCROFT WI

Charity number: 1171825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.08k £3.41k £627 £4.07k £5.29k
Total expenditure £4.12k £2.79k £1.11k £4.91k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A