Trustees HOLLYCROFT WI
Charity number: 1171825

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Viner | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Genesta Cope | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET OSBORNE | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANE WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN FOOT | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LISSA JANE STEWART | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSAMUND ANNE RATHBONE | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELLEN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.