Financial history SHREE SWAMINARAYAN TEMPLE CARDIFF

Charity Number: 509713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £94.97k £145.50k £245.95k £226.75k £228.98k
Total expenditure £102.63k £101.43k £212.22k £488.21k £444.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.20k