BASILDON BOROUGH HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1176037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public, in the history and heritage of Basildon Borough through the collection, preservation of records, material and artefacts of historical significance. By making available through display and talks at the societies location and around the borough - 'Green Centre', Wat Tyler Country Park, Pitsea Hall Lane, Pitsea, Basildon, Essex SS16 4UH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,570
Total expenditure: £1,936

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Belgium
  • France
  • Germany

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BASILDON HERITAGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD VINCENT GREGORY Chair 19 April 2017
None on record
Danny Lawrence Trustee 20 October 2021
BASILDON PRIDE CIO
Received: On time
Geraldine Evans JP Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
NORMAN CHARLES BAMBRIDGE Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
TONY BALL Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.95k £3.22k £1.20k £2.96k £2.57k
Total expenditure £6.10k £1.35k £2.32k £3.80k £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 November 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 WELBECK DRIVE
LANGDON HILLS
BASILDON
SS16 6BU
Phone:
07968313614
Website:

WWW.BASILDONHERITAGE.ORG.UK