Financial history EXIT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £71.36k £107.14k £214.89k £296.27k £242.01k
Total expenditure £82.17k £121.25k £183.07k £255.22k £302.08k
Income from government contracts £52.16k £66.22k £142.45k £0 £84.62k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A