CHILDCARE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ChildCare Ministries is a faith based organization looking to assist orphaned and socially challenged children in Southern Africa in particular Zimbabwe and Zambia by providing educational nutritional and empowerment support. CCMI will be raising resources to support payment of school fees provision of stationary and uniforms, furniture for classroom, provision of food through school gardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 31 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDHLA SAMUEL DHLODHLO | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
SIBONGILE DIYA | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.20k | £1.80k | £6.34k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.20k | £2.20k | £6.34k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 May 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 May 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 June 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 October 2021 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 October 2021 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN IN THE SOUTHERN AFRICAN REGION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLEAN WATER, FOOD, AND PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR APPROPRIATE TECHNOLOGY IN FOOD PRODUCTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Miller Close
Langstone
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP18 2LE
- Phone:
- 07460760760
- Website:
-
07460760760
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window