Financial history SCARTHO COMMUNITY HUB

Charity number: 1176065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.85k £36.98k £20.25k £21.23k £24.10k
Total expenditure £2.55k £795 £9.52k £22.60k £17.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k N/A N/A N/A