SCARTHO COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY SERVICE, TOGETHER WITH ADDITIONAL FACILITIES. TO ENCOURAGE, NURTURE AND ASSIST IN THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN 'LEARNING' AS A LEISURE ACTIVITY. TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF THE RESIDENTS OF SCARTHO AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INVOLVEMENT AND WELFARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SILVESTER | Chair | 16 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Bartlett | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ronald shepherd cllr | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.85k | £36.98k | £20.25k | £21.23k | £24.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.55k | £795 | £9.52k | £22.60k | £17.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 19 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SCARTHO AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scartho Community Library
St Giles Avenue
Grimsby
DN33 2HB
- Phone:
- 01472 752841
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window